U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brunston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 06, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 05, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 17, 2020: [Response]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 11, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 03, 2020: [Supplement]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Response]
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Letter]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • May 20, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 20, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 19, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 15, 2020: [Declaration]
  • May 15, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 14, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 12, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 11, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 11, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • May 08, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 29, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 28, 2020: [Response]
  • April 20, 2020: [Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 03, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 29, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Transcript]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 22, 2019: [Discovery]
  • February 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2019: [Request]
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 21, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 21, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 21, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.