U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yankton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 19, 2022: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • January 12, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 27, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 24, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 18, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 14, 2020: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 16, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 20, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 08, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 15, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • April 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Request]
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 07, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 02, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 02, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.