U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bettelyoun
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 15, 2025: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 24, 2025: [Furlough]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 15, 2020: [Forfeiture]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 09, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 06, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 16, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 28, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 22, 2019: [Suppress]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 03, 2019: [Request]
  • January 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 02, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 02, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 02, 2019: [Request]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 02, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 02, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 02, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.