U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30155-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Emery et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 12, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2022: [Text Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 08, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 07, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • October 27, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 26, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 26, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 16, 2020: [Forfeiture]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sealed Evaluation]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 24, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • March 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2019: [Consent]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 07, 2019: [Request]
  • January 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 07, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 03, 2019: [Request]
  • January 03, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 03, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 02, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 02, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 02, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 02, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.