U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-50017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jumping Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 27, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 20, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 29, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 28, 2020: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 28, 2020: [Request for Warrant]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 02, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 31, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 31, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 06, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 01, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 20, 2019: [Furlough]
  • February 12, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 04, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 04, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.