U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-50001
  • Case Name: Sherry Lynn Monge
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice (Court)]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule D]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee(s) (Individual)]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BPP Disclosure of Compensation - B2800]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Form 119)]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.