U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'Rourke
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 21, 2019: [Extend]
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 26, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 08, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.