U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patterson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 09, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Competency Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2019: [Evaluation]
  • August 13, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 09, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 15, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 09, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • January 09, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.