U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Has Horns
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 16, 2025: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 08, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 08, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 16, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 16, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 16, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 16, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 16, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 16, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • June 14, 2019: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Furlough]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Furlough]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 22, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 06, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • February 05, 2019: [Request]
  • February 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 04, 2019: [Bail Report]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 28, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.