U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maomee et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • April 13, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 22, 2019: [Forfeiture]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • September 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 29, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 27, 2019: [Expedite ]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 19, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 12, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [For Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 01, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 08, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 03, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 17, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 17, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 17, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 17, 2019: [Discovery]
  • January 16, 2019: [Request]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 15, 2019: [Discovery]
  • January 15, 2019: [Request]
  • January 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • January 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 14, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 09, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.