U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Segich
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 03, 2020: [Evaluation]
  • January 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • November 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 21, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 18, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 17, 2019: [Discovery]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2019: [Request]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.