U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cool
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • July 28, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 28, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 20, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 30, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 30, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 03, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 24, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 09, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 03, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 29, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Letter]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 30, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • April 29, 2019: [Request]
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.