U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Christensen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 01, 2025: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Mail Returned]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Response]
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 25, 2021: [Response]
  • January 25, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • January 22, 2021: [Response]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 21, 2021: [Extend]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 19, 2021: [Extend]
  • January 11, 2021: [Supplement]
  • January 04, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Notice of Intent to Submit Supplemental Briefing]
  • December 21, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • December 21, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • December 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 18, 2020: [Extend]
  • December 07, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Supplement]
  • November 23, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 24, 2020: [Response]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 18, 2020: [Extend]
  • August 07, 2020: [Supplement]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • July 24, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 30, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 06, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 27, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • January 17, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 16, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 29, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 28, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 28, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 14, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 24, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2019: [Furlough]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2019: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • September 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 02, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 08, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 05, 2019: [Receipt for Payment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 02, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Response]
  • July 09, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 03, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • July 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 27, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 27, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 25, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 24, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 24, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 18, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 18, 2019: [Request]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 13, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • June 13, 2019: [Arrest]
  • June 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 13, 2019: [Add Counts - Superseding]
  • June 13, 2019: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • June 04, 2019: [Furlough]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 03, 2019: [Furlough]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 05, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 04, 2019: [Response]
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 02, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 01, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Response]
  • March 26, 2019: [Request]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 05, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2019: [Discovery]
  • March 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Arrest]
  • March 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 28, 2019: [Text Order]
  • February 28, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 01, 2019: [Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Response]
  • January 25, 2019: [Request]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 25, 2019: [Discovery]
  • January 24, 2019: [Response]
  • January 23, 2019: [Request]
  • January 22, 2019: [Request]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 17, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 17, 2019: [Request]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 16, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 15, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 15, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 14, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 14, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 14, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 14, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 10, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 09, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.