U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rains
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 12, 2020: [For Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 09, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 09, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 26, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 18, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 18, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 18, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 28, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 28, 2020: [Seal Existing Document]
  • May 28, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 22, 2020: [Exclude]
  • May 21, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 11, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 31, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 01, 2019: [Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 08, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.