U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Primeaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 29, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Transcript]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 29, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 15, 2019: [Discovery]
  • January 11, 2019: [Request]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 09, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.