U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Mail Returned]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 18, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • February 12, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 22, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 13, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 02, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 02, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 02, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 07, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 22, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 22, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 08, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Subpoena(s)]
  • July 22, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2019: [Joinder]
  • May 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 22, 2019: [Dismiss Count]
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 21, 2019: [Dismiss Count]
  • May 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Discovery]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 12, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 24, 2019: [Discovery]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 23, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 23, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 11, 2019: [Discovery]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.