U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Khamvongsa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 16, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 24, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 29, 2019: [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
  • May 21, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 21, 2019: [Response]
  • February 21, 2019: [Discovery]
  • February 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2019: [Request]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 09, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 09, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 09, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.