U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lima-Figueroa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 06, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • August 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Receipt]
  • July 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 23, 2019: [Discovery]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2019: [Response]
  • January 11, 2019: [Request]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 10, 2019: [Interpreter Needed]
  • January 09, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • January 09, 2019: [Seal Case]
  • January 09, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.