U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Response]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 09, 2020: [Extend]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • November 09, 2020: [Supplement]
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 12, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 04, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 30, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 21, 2019: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • June 21, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 12, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 12, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Discovery]
  • January 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 17, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 16, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • January 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 11, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 10, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 09, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.