U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 11, 2025: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Appeal Record Returned]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
  • March 26, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 23, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 22, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • January 22, 2020: [Transcript]
  • January 21, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 21, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • January 21, 2020: [Transcript]
  • January 08, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • January 08, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • December 27, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 10, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 06, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 21, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 13, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 08, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 26, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • September 26, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • September 26, 2019: [Verdict]
  • September 25, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • September 25, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • September 25, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 24, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • September 24, 2019: [Jury List]
  • September 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 23, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 23, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 20, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
  • September 20, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 11, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 10, 2019: [In Limine]
  • September 10, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 18, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • January 23, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 11, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Request]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 11, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 10, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.