U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Demarrias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 27, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • April 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 03, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • April 02, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 02, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 18, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 14, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 11, 2019: [Request]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 11, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.