U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mora
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2020: [Consent]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 02, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 27, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 27, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 21, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 22, 2019: [Request]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 17, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.