U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-30066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yellow Thunder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 05, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 05, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 05, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 24, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 25, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 25, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 25, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 18, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.