U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-01002
  • Case Name: Brooks et al v. Coteau Des Prairies Hospital, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 28, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 24, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 18, 2019: [Response]
  • October 17, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 02, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • September 09, 2019: [Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Affidavit]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 07, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Form 52 Report]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 13, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • February 08, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • February 05, 2019: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 01, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Service]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
  • January 28, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 21, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • January 17, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • January 17, 2019: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.