U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black Spotted Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 27, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 05, 2019: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 04, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [Stipulation]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 30, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 30, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 29, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 29, 2019: [Request]
  • January 29, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 28, 2019: [Request]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.