U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 21, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 16, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • October 12, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 19, 2021: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 15, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 02, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 31, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 29, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 29, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 31, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 31, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 31, 2019: [Request]
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 31, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.