U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bagola
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 26, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 19, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 14, 2021: [Extend]
  • April 01, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 06, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 23, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 23, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 23, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 23, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 20, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2020: [Waiver]
  • March 20, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2020: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 17, 2020: [Request for Warrant]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 30, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 30, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 30, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 30, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • October 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 21, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 01, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 18, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 25, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • February 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 01, 2019: [Request]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.