U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peltier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 03, 2020: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 29, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • April 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 18, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 18, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 05, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 28, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 28, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 28, 2019: [Request]
  • February 28, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 27, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 27, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.