U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 15, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 21, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 20, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 20, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • May 17, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 17, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2019: [Consent]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Continue]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 25, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2019: [Request]
  • January 25, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 24, 2019: [Request]
  • January 24, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.