U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 03, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 03, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 24, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 18, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 13, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 11, 2019: [Request]
  • February 10, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 10, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 08, 2019: [Request]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 04, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 04, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.