U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leader Charge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 13, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 10, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 10, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 21, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 21, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 21, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • January 20, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 07, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 24, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 10, 2019: [Extend]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 30, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 27, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 17, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 17, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 16, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 15, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 15, 2019: [Extend]
  • July 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 11, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 08, 2019: [Brief]
  • July 08, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice]
  • July 02, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Witness List]
  • June 13, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 13, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 13, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 19, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 19, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 17, 2019: [Request]
  • April 16, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 16, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2019: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • April 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2019: [Request]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.