U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Laroche
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 27, 2019: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 16, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 09, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 30, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 29, 2019: [Supplement]
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 08, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 05, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 20, 2019: [Furlough]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Request]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 01, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2019: [Arrest]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.