U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hussman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 29, 2020: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 31, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 31, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 30, 2020: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 30, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Request]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 31, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.