U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Island
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 15, 2020: [Forfeiture]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 10, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 12, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 12, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 02, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 02, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • June 11, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 27, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 27, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 27, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 27, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 26, 2019: [Arrest]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.