U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ducheneaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 13, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 13, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 13, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 30, 2019: [Request]
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 24, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.