U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Judgment - Amended]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 05, 2021: [Response]
  • January 05, 2021: [Leave to]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Supplement]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 04, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • December 04, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • December 03, 2020: [Admission]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 21, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 09, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 25, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • January 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 24, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.