U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sweeris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 03, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 02, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 30, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Request]
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 24, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.