U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wade
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 07, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 06, 2021: [Sentencing]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Consent]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 05, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice]
  • May 01, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 29, 2020: [Evaluation]
  • April 28, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 27, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 27, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 27, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 24, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 23, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 22, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 28, 2020: [Extend]
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 06, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 05, 2019: [Request]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.