U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Myers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 22, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 18, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 30, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 17, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 17, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 17, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • January 17, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 07, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 07, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 07, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 04, 2019: [Consent]
  • October 04, 2019: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • October 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 12, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2019: [Transcript]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 19, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • July 15, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 22, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Text Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 25, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • March 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • March 20, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 19, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Request]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.