U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Norquist
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 11, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 05, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 27, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 27, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 14, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 09, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 30, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 16, 2019: [Request]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 25, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.