U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. German
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 26, 2020: [Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 17, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 15, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 12, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 11, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 06, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 04, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 03, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 05, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 05, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 20, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 15, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 04, 2019: [Stipulation]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Request]
  • January 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 25, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.