U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sperlich
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 18, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • November 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • September 10, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2019: [Bail Report]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2019: [Stipulation]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Request]
  • January 30, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 29, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 29, 2019: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.