U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tail
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 31, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 08, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 29, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 29, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 27, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 27, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 24, 2020: [Extend]
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2020: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • April 14, 2020: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • April 07, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 23, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 31, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 31, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 31, 2020: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • January 31, 2020: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • January 31, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 09, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 09, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Transcript]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 22, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • August 16, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 16, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • August 06, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • July 19, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 01, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 01, 2019: [Request]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 31, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 30, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 30, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 28, 2019: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.