U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chasing Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Response]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 22, 2022: [Extend]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extend]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 10, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 10, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 05, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 05, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 05, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 05, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 05, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 05, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 05, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Request]
  • May 01, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 18, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 05, 2020: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 05, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Request]
  • October 31, 2019: [Discovery]
  • October 30, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 23, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 10, 2019: [Request]
  • October 10, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2019: [Request]
  • August 28, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 20, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • August 13, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 17, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 11, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2019: [Request]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 04, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 30, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 29, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 29, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 29, 2019: [Request]
  • January 29, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 29, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 29, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 28, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.