U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Siers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 14, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 27, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • May 28, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • May 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 23, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 23, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 23, 2019: [Extend]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 26, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • February 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [Request]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 01, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 31, 2019: [Request]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 31, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 31, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 31, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 31, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.