U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rogers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • November 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [For Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • November 17, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • November 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Response]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Memorandum Letter]
  • October 30, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 30, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 16, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • August 17, 2020: [Seal Existing Document]
  • August 17, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 17, 2020: [Furlough]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 27, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 23, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 15, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 01, 2019: [Extend]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 27, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • February 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • February 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 06, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 05, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 01, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 01, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • February 01, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.