U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reuer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 22, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 08, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 04, 2020: [Consent]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • May 20, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 20, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 08, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 23, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2020: [Furlough]
  • March 03, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 07, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 07, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Consent]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 24, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 30, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2019
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 03, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 26, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 21, 2019: [Reply]
  • February 19, 2019: [Response]
  • February 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 13, 2019: [Brief]
  • February 11, 2019: [Transcript]
  • February 11, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2019: [Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • February 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • February 06, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.