U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-50020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 29, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 11, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 11, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 05, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Request]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 06, 2019: [Interpreter Needed]
  • February 06, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 06, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • February 06, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.