U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-30012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Laster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 06, 2019: [Rule 20 - Transfer Out]
  • March 05, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice]
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 21, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • February 12, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • February 06, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.