U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-40018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nelson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • September 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 09, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 09, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 14, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 06, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Request]
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 11, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 11, 2019: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 11, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.